This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 13:52:25 (UTC).

WEI-Shing SU vs. Lynnette Bassett

Case Summary

On 11/22/2016 WEI-Shing SU filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lynnette Bassett. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9392

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEI-Shing SU

Defendant

Bassett, Lynnette

Other

ALL OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steven R

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: WEI-Shing SU; Bassett, Lynnette; ALL OCCUPANTS; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; WEI-Shing SU; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 455 W. Mesa #109 Clovis, CA 93612; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Bassett, Lynnette

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied.

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $ 9,435.00

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 9,590.68

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $110.00 Credit: $0 Interest: $20.68

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Lynnette Bassett

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 to 10 Only

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: Type of Document: Order to Post GRANTED as to Lynnette Bassett and to All Tenants in Possession

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: Notice of UDDI

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; WEI-Shing SU; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against:; Bassett, Lynnette; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $6,750.00; Holdover Damages: $1,325.00; Attorney Fees: $950.00; Costs: $410.00; Total: $9,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: WEI-Shing SU; Bassett, Lynnette; ALL OCCUPANTS; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; WEI-Shing SU; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 455 W. Mesa #109 Clovis, CA 93612; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Bassett, Lynnette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $ 9,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 9,590.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $110.00 Credit: $0 Interest: $20.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Financial info for WEI-Shing SU: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00008010 Hrdlicka, Steven R $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Financial info for WEI-Shing SU: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Financial info for WEI-Shing SU: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00003681 Hrdlicka, Steven R $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Financial info for WEI-Shing SU: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Financial info for WEI-Shing SU: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00039049 Hrdlicka, Steven R $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Financial info for WEI-Shing SU: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial info for WEI-Shing SU: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00038750 Hrdlicka, Steven R $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial info for WEI-Shing SU: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial: WEI-Shing SU; Total Financial Assessment $310.00; Total Payments and Credits $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.