This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 17:31:55 (UTC).

Wasserman Media Group, LLC vs. Quincy Pondexter

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Wasserman Media Group, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Quincy Pondexter. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Simpson, Alan and Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3797

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Simpson, Alan

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wasserman Media Group, LLC

Defendant

Pondexter, Quincy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moses, Sarah E

Defendant Attorney

Caterina, Tiffany R

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Wasserman Media Group, LLC; Pondexter, Quincy; Comment: With Prejudice

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Stipulation Filed

Stipulation Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution; Comment: ADR Stip

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Jury Deposit; Comment: jury fee deposit.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Comment: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Notice Filed

Plaintiff's Notice of Deposit Of Jury Fees; Comment: Jury fee Deposit.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

04/25/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

04/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution

03/29/2019: Stipulation Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution

Minute Order Attachment

02/07/2019: Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

02/04/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice of Jury Deposit

01/31/2019: Notice of Jury Deposit

Jury Deposit

01/31/2019: Jury Deposit

Plaintiff's Notice of Deposit Of Jury Fees

01/18/2019: Plaintiff's Notice of Deposit Of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

01/18/2019: Case Management Statement

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Jury Req by both; 3-5 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Wasserman Media Group, LLC; Pondexter, Quincy; Comment: With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator:Hon. Louis Meisinger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: Jury Req by both; 3-5 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 10/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Quincy Pondexter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC/CJAP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wasserman Media Group, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-74933 Wasserman Media Group, LLC $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wasserman Media Group, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Wasserman Media Group, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less