Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/03/2018 at 11:21:11 (UTC).

Warren Properties Inc v Kim Andersen/UD

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Warren Properties Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Kim Andersen/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2257

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Warren Properties INC

Defendant

Andersen, Kim

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coronado, Louie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 15-MAY-2013 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 14-MAY-2013 by KROSPIGLIOSI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on entire action upon default of defendant(s) signed by Judge Ikeda and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Warren Properties Inc against Kim Anderson in the amount of: Past-due rent: $ 664.00 Holdover damages: $ 664.00 Attorney Fees: $ 500.00 Costs: $ 460.00 Total: $ 2288.00 Cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: K Rospigliosi (jv) Reporter: 2/50/08 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages Money damages granted See signed order entered in the amount of: Attorney Louie Coronado is sworn and testifies. Copy of the rental agreement is marked and received as Plaintiffs exhibit #1. The court takes judicial notice of the 3-day notice and proof of service already in the court file. Order signed on the record. Notice waived. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 02:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • Writ filed wholly satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly satisfied. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Matter set for hearing- Comment: Matter set for Money Damages on 05-13-13 at 2:00p.m. in dept #401. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CLCE301327.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • App for Publication of Summons- Comment: Order for service of Summons by Posting Publication signed by Judge on . mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 13-MAR-2013 by JLEYVA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE301055.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 12-MAR-2013 by LVANG.

    Read MoreRead Less