This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 04:42:26 (UTC).

Wa Funding,INC vs. Gabriel Cordova

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 Wa Funding,INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Gabriel Cordova. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7170

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wa Funding,INC

Defendant

Cordova, Gabriel

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cadwalader, John W.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premi; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Wa Funding,INC; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Cordova, Gabriel; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,250.00; Holdover Damages: $270.79; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $450.00; Total: $2,470.79; Comment: conformed copy in box 53

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Wa Funding,INC; Cordova, Gabriel; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Wa Funding,INC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 608 N. Fulton St Apt 102 Fresno CA 93728; Awarded Against:; Cordova, Gabriel

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: "Forwarded to. Dept 404"

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Gabriel Cordova

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premi; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Wa Funding,INC; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Cordova, Gabriel; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,250.00; Holdover Damages: $270.79; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $450.00; Total: $2,470.79; Comment: conformed copy in box 53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Wa Funding,INC; Cordova, Gabriel; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Wa Funding,INC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 608 N. Fulton St Apt 102 Fresno CA 93728; Awarded Against:; Cordova, Gabriel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forwarded to clerks office on 11/01/16 for further processing.Forward to: Dept 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Chambers Work - Post- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Court Judgment- Request for Court Judgment; Comment: "Forwarded to. Dept 404"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed- Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment Box #53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified- Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Financial info for Wa Funding,INC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00033228 Caldwalader, John W. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Financial info for Wa Funding,INC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Financial info for Wa Funding,INC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00031326 Caldwalader, John W. $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Financial info for Wa Funding,INC: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Financial: Wa Funding,INC; Total Financial Assessment $265.00; Total Payments and Credits $265.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.