This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:19:49 (UTC).

Villa Madrid Partnership vs. Mickie Beloat/UD/JU

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Villa Madrid Partnership filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mickie Beloat/UD/JU. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1524

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villa Madrid Partnership

Defendant

Beloat, Mickie

Others

All Other Occupants

Villa Madrid Apartments

Fresno Credit Bureau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Suhr, John D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Assignment of judgment filed- Comment: Assignment of judgment filed assigning collection to Fresno Credit Bureau. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE331089.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 05-MAR-2014 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on entire action upon default of defendant(s) Mickie Beloat signed by Judge D. Ikeda and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff(s) Villa Madrid Partnership dba Villa Madrid Apartments against Defendant(s) Mickie Beloat in the amount of: Past due rent: $ Holdover Damages: $ 1256.86 Attorney Fees: $ 500.00 Costs: $ 442.50 Total: $ 2199.36 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J Verbera Reporter: 2:14:57 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: John Suhr, Esq. Defendant: Money Damages granted see signed order Attorney John Suhr is sworn and testifies. Court takes judicial notice of the rental agreement, 3-day notice and Proof of Service already in the court file. Order signed on the record. Notice waived. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 02:02 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 23-DEC-2013 by JLEYVA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 23-DEC-2013 by JLEYVA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Amended document filed- Comment: 1st Amended complaint and summons filed. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 17-DEC-2013 by KCLUGSTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE324002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 MM Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MMEZA.

    Read MoreRead Less