This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 09:59:24 (UTC).

Vandenberghe vs. Krueger/UD/JUDGMENT

Case Summary

On 01/31/2012 Vandenberghe filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Krueger/UD/JUDGMENT. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0124

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vandenberghe Properties, Inc.

Defendant

Krueger, Jeffrey Lee

Others

Collectibles Management Resources

Krueger, Jeffrey

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Krueger, Jeffery Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • Return filed- Comment: Final Return to Court Writ of Execution filed partially paid in the sum of $6.00. af 01/20/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE329517.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $4,967.90. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0 Interest: $700.20 Costs: $53.00 MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Assignment of judgment filed- Comment: Assignment of judgment filed assigning collection to Collectibles Management Resources. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Substitution of attorney filed- Comment: Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Steven Hrdlicka New atty: Party Representing Self lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL39711.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 31-JAN-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 31-JAN-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL37816.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • Financial info for Vandenberghe Properties, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # 38345 Vandenberghe Properties, Inc. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • Financial info for Vandenberghe Properties, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • Financial: Vandenberghe Properties, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less