This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 08:53:10 (UTC).

Valley Children's Hospital vs John Moua MD

Case Summary

On 09/22/2015 Valley Children's Hospital filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against John Moua MD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Conklin, Jonathan, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Ikeda, Dale, Simpson, Alan, Black, Donald, Snauffer, Mark, Gaab, Kimberly and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2967

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Conklin, Jonathan

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Ikeda, Dale

Simpson, Alan

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

Gaab, Kimberly

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Valley Children's Hospital

Valley Children's Specialty Medical Group, Inc.

Defendants

Moua, John, Medical Doctor

Do, Paul Manh, Medical Doctor

Lee, David (Wee Kiat), Medical Doctor

University Pediatric Specialists, Inc.

Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wiseman, Dylan W

Wanger, Oliver W.

Doerksen, Charles L

Defendant Attorneys

Thompson, Timothy L.

Tucker, Douglas

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of reassignment of judge for all purposes ** AS OF 2/26/18**

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's certificate of Mailing attached.

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: Notice of Joinder in Defendants' Reply re Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint

Notice Filed

Response; Comment: Notice of Joinder in Defendants' Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint

Objection filed

Objection; Comment: to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Writ of Possession.

Request for Judical Notice

Request; Comment: in Support of Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: to defendants' motion to stay

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: *Public-redacts materials from conditionally sealed record* in support of their motion to stay proceedings pending conclusion of the peer review hearing provided for under Section 8.1 of Valley Children's Hospital's Medical Staff Bylaws

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Dylan W. Wiseman in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Ex Parte Application

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Douglas Tucker New Attorney: Timothy L. Thompson

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry???of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of its Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Dylan W. Wiseman in support of plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to stay

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: motion to seal portions of motion to stay proceedings pending conclusion of the peer review hearing provided for under section 8.1 of Valley Children's Hospital Medical Staff Bylaws

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: to continue filing and service date and meet and confer deadline for Plaintiffs' second amended complaint

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: Order After Hearing On Demurrer To First Amended Complaint By Defendants John Moua, Paul Cuong Manh Do, David (Wee Kiat) Lee, University Pediatric Specialists, Inc., and Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc.; And Motion To Strike By Paul Cuong Manh Do. Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached.

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • General Motion- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Comment: Modify stay; Dylan Wiseman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply filed- Reply; Comment: Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order Modifying Stay to Permit Completion of Limited Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Supplemental Proof of Services for Substitutions of Attorney; Comment: Supplemental Proof of Services for Substitutions of Attorney for John Moua, M.D. and David (Wee Kiat) Lee, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: New Attorney:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: New Attorney:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection filed- Defendants' Objection to Evidence in Submitted by Plaintiff; Comment: Defendants' Objection to Evidence in Submitted by Plaintiff in Support of Motion for Order to Modify Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration of Timothy L. Thompson in Support of Defendants'; Comment: Declaration of Timothy L. Thompson in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Order to Modify Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Judical Notice- Request for Judical Notice; Comment: in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Modify Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
368 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2015
  • Financial info for Valley Children's Hospital: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Financial info for Valley Children's Hospital: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00024246 Wanger Jones $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Financial info for Valley Children's Hospital: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Financial info for Valley Children's Hospital: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00023430 Eddings Attorney Support Service $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Financial info for Valley Children's Hospital: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Financial info for Valley Children's Hospital: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00023251 Eddings Attorney Support $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Financial info for Valley Children's Hospital: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Financial info for Valley Children's Hospital: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00022949 Eddings Attorney Support Service $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Financial info for Valley Children's Hospital: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Financial: Valley Children's Hospital; Total Financial Assessment $1,145.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,145.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.