This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/06/2022 at 19:42:31 (UTC).

Vahan Panossian vs Lisa Panossian

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 Vahan Panossian filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Lisa Panossian. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, McGuire, Rosemary, Skiles, Jon M, Gamoian, Lisa, Hopper, Cindy, Janian, Paulette, Zepeda, Francine, Mangano, Robert and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0589

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

McGuire, Rosemary

Skiles, Jon M

Gamoian, Lisa

Hopper, Cindy

Janian, Paulette

Zepeda, Francine

Mangano, Robert

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Panossian, Vahan

Respondent

Panossian, Lisa

Minors

Panossian, Sareen

Panossian, Sarkis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Barsamyan, Vardui Rose

Armas, J. Todd

Respondent Attorney

Thornhill, William T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure; Comment: Declaration Re: Service of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketReturn Letter; Comment: on judgment documents. Unfiled FL-190 form, unfiled copy of Stipulation for Judgment, and two (2) self-addressed stamped envelope placed in box #7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Panossian, Lisa: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-22890 Panossian, Lisa $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Panossian, Lisa: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketProposed Documents; Comment: stip/order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketSettlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProposed Documents; Comment: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProposed Documents; Comment: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProposed Documents; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProposed Documents; Comment: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Panossian, Lisa: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2017-00004976 Panossian, Lisa $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Panossian, Lisa: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Panossian, Lisa; Total Financial Assessment $925.00; Total Payments and Credits $925.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketResponse; Comment: to: Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketDocument filed; Comment: Document: poss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Panossian, Vahan: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2017-00001852 Panossian, Vahan $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Panossian, Vahan: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Panossian, Vahan; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketProperty Declaration; Comment: Community and Quasi-Community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution with Children; Comment: with Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thornhill, William T.