This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 13:59:50 (UTC).

US Bank vs Penelope E Becker

Case Summary

On 09/05/2014 US Bank filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Penelope E Becker. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2600

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank National Association

Defendants

Becker, Penelope E

Barlow, Anita Joyce

All Persons, Unknown

Does, 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Treadwell, James H.

Cunningham & Treadwell Warner Center Towers #840 Woodland Hills Ca 913673640

21800 Oxnard, ST

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

moc_20170125193050.pdf; Comment: Memorandum of Costs

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC setting for September 19, 2016 at 1:30 PM in Room 104.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Automatic Stay and Filing of Chapter 13 Bankruptcy by Defendant Anita Joyce Barlow

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: All Persons, Unknown; Does, 1-100; Comment: without prejudice as to All persos unknown claiming any legal or Equitable right Title, Estate Lien or interest in the Proprtery described in the Complaint adverse the the Plaintiffs Title or any clovud on Plaintiffs Titel Thereto, and named Does 1 through 100

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment by Court After Default on Complaint

Request for Judical Notice

rjn_20170125192559.pdf; Comment: Notice

Declaration Filed

jht.decl_20170125192815.pdf; Comment: Declaration

Request for Court Judgment

req.ent.def_20170125193127.pdf; Comment: request for court judgment forwarded to RA with file

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of James H. Treadwell Re: Status of Anita J. Barlow's Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Action

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Bankruptcy filed by Anita Joyce Barlow - Penelope Becker has been dismissed BSC set for 11/19/15 @ 10 am in Dept 401

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: US Bank National Association; Becker, Penelope E; Barlow, Anita Joyce; All Persons, Unknown; Does, 1-100; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; US Bank National Association; Awarded Against:; Barlow, Anita Joyce; Status: Granted; Status Date: 03/14/2017; Status Comment: property only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: All Persons, Unknown; Does, 1-100; Comment: without prejudice as to All persos unknown claiming any legal or Equitable right Title, Estate Lien or interest in the Proprtery described in the Complaint adverse the the Plaintiffs Title or any clovud on Plaintiffs Titel Thereto, and named Does 1 through 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment by Court After Default on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Assignment of Judge Alan Simpson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- prop.ord_20170125192418.pdf; Comment: Proposed Order Fowarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Judical Notice- rjn_20170125192559.pdf; Comment: Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- jht.decl_20170125192815.pdf; Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- bs_20170125192928.pdf; Comment: Brief Summary of Case in Support for Default Judgement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- req,dism_20170125193021.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2014
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE194166.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 05-SEP-2014 by CPRENDERGAST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on New Complaint filed. csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: csp Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: csp Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for US Bank National Association: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00009345 One Legal Services $36.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for US Bank National Association: Transaction Assessment $36.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial: US Bank National Association; Total Financial Assessment $36.00; Total Payments and Credits $36.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

E-FILED

JAMES H. TREADWELL, Bar No. 155983 4/11/2017 12:22:48 PM

G. RICHARD GREGORYVI&BarNo. 310639 FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT CUNNINGHAM, TREADWELL & BARTELSTONE :

Warner Center Towers, Suite 840 By: C. Cogburn, Deputy

21800 Oxnard Street

Woodland Hills, California 91367-3640

PH: (818)348-1112

FAX: (818) 340-6772

email: mai law.c

Attorneys for Plaintiff, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, IN TRUST FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2007-AHL2, ASSET-BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-AHL2

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF FRESNO

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, IN TRUST FOR THE REGISTERED

HOLDERS OF CITIGROUP MORTGAGE

LOAN TRUST 2007-AHL2, ASSET-BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-AHL2,

CASE NO. 14 CE CG 02600

Honorable Alan M. Simpson Department 503

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT ON COMPLAINT

Plaintiffs, VS.

PENELOPE E. BECKER, an Individual; ANITA JOYCE BARLOW, an Individual; AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE

PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE

PLAINTIFF’S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF’S TITLE THERETO, NAMED AS DOES 1 through 100, inclusive,

Date: March 14, 2017 Dept: 503

Defendants.

“ass?’ ot “vasg? gt e ut?

EILED FRESNO SUPERIOR COURT

- By—— RPN B

gy til

RECEIVED VIA E-FILE 01/2672017

FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT |.

By: Carolyn Prendergast, Depuly

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF FRESNO

TRUSTEE, IN TRUST FOR THE REGISTE HOLDERS OF CITIGROUP MORTGAGE ) Honorable Dale Ikeda LOAN TRUST 2007-AHL2, ASSET-BACKED Department 401 PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES K 2007-AHL2,

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS ; CASE NO. 14 CE CG 02600

- SEPEFSTD] JUDGMENT BY OURT AFTER DEFAULT ON COMPLAINT

Plaintiffs, Vs,

PENELOPE E. BECKER, an Individual; ANITA [NO HEARING REQUIRED)]| JOYCE BARLOW, an [ndividual; AND ALL

PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY -

LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, Cass Management Conference ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTERESTINTHE re: Default Judgment:

PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS Date: January 23, 2017 COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE Time: 1:30 p.m.

| PLAINTIFF’S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON - Room: 104

| PLAINTIFF’S TITLE THERETO, NAMED AS

'DOES 1 through 100, inclusive,

Defendants. }. Defendant, Anita Joyce Barlow, having been duly served with the Summons and Verified

Complaint filed September S, 2014, by Plaintiff, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, if

Trust for the Registered Holders of Citi group Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-AHL2, Asset-Backed

Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AHL2 (“U.S. Bank”), and having failed to appear in this !

Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AHL2 (“U.S. Bank”), and having failed to appear in this ! IM.wpd

IM.wpd

Y—_

W 00 ~ o W AW N

eud 0 )

— O

action or file a response to the Verified Complaint, and the default of defendant having been duly entered on November 12, 2014; and the dismissals without prejudice having been filed as to Defendants Penclope E. Becker and All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Property Described in this Complaint Adverse to the Plaintiff’s Title, or Any Cloud on Plaintiff’s Title Thereto, Named as DOES 1 Through 100; and upon proof being made to the satigfaction of the Court,

IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, DECREED, AND DECLARED AS FOLLOWS:

l. Thatcertain Deed of Trust, originally in favor of Home Funds Direct, which was sold, transferred and assigned to Plaintiff, U.S. Bank National Association, ag Trustee, in Trust for the Registered Holders of Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust iGO?-AHI..Z, Assget-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AHL?2, securing a promissory nete in the original principal amount of $325,000.00, a true, correct and complete copy of which Deed of Trust is attached hereto as Exhibit

| “A”, and incorporated herein by reference, is now, and has at all time since February 17, 2007 been,

a velid and existing first trust deed lien against the entirety of the subject property commonly known

il as 1115 North College Avenue, Fresno, California 93728, and legally described as follows:

ALL THAT PARCEL OF LAND IN FRESNO COUNTY, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, AS MORE FULLY DESCRIBED IN DEED INST # 98016529, ID # 452-045-05, BEING KNOWN AND DESIGNATED AS LOT 8, 9, BLOCK 2, FILED IN PLAT BOOK 5, PAGE 52.

LOTS 8 AND 9 IN BLOCK 2 OF ALHAMBRA TRACT, AS PER MAP RECORDED IN BOOK 5 AT PAGE 52 OF RECORD OF SURVEYS, RECORDS OF SAID COUNTY.

2. No party shall receive costs or attorneys fees. 3. This Judgment is a final judgment for all purposes.

pATED: ot /5] o/ 7