This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/08/2018 at 02:13:17 (UTC).

U.S. AIRCONDITIONING DIST v LAMBERT etal

Case Summary

On 09/08/2009 U S AIRCONDITIONING DIST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAMBERT etal. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1360

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. AIRCONDITIONING DISTRIBUTORS CONDITIONING

Defendants

Lambert, Douglas

Fresno Lodging LLC

Pro Built Management, Inc.

Other

Lambert Air Conditioning

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hernquist, William C., II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Presiding Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • Presiding default judgment- Comment: In accordance with order signed by Judge Fain on 04/13/10, Court orders judgment for plaintiff US Airconditioning Distributors, Inc. against defendant Douglas Lambert dba Lambert Air Conditioning in the sum of : Principal: $0.00 Interest: $2,029.43 Atty Fees: $2,766.85 Costs: $604.00 Total: $5,400.28 vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forwarded to: Judge Fain vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default previously entered on 12/14/09 as to Douglas Lambert dba Lambert Air Conditioning. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service of Request for Dismissal- Pro Built; Request for Dismissal- Fresno Lodging; Request for Court Judgment filed. Served on Fresno Lodging LLC; Pro Built Management; Douglas Lamber by mail on 04/07/10. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Bernard J Faller, in support of judgment by default by court filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of William C. Hernquist, II in support of judgment by default by court filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Dismissal of party- Comment: Request for dismissal of party Pro Built Management Inc. filed and dismissal entered WITH prejudice. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Dismissal of party- Comment: Request for dismissal of party Fresno Lodging LLC filed and dismissal entered WITH prejudice. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants 1-100 filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2009
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of mailing filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of diligence filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Sarah Lambert, mailed on 10/19/09. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Fresno Lodging LLC, Agent for service Timothy W. Scheid on 9-9-09 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$330.00 was made on receipt CLCL26991.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 08-SEP-2009 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.