This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/06/2018 at 21:45:14 (UTC).

Unifund CCR Partners vs Vince Cooper/CC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2009 Unifund CCR Partners filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Vince Cooper/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0399

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund CCR Partners

Defendant

Cooper, Vince

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Loeb, Steven S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2009
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Return filed- Comment: Writ of execution issued 04/15/13 expired. Final Return to Court filed, wholly unsatisfied. tll 12/9/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE343674.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Los Angeles in the amount of $ 27,066.55 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 8,913.12 Costs: $ 226.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE304051.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Los Angeles in the amount of $ 24,321.41 . ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 6,258.98 Costs: $ 135.00 ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE299863.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $23184.35. th.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2009
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Vince Cooper. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants 1-10 filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Jane Doe, Co Occupant, mailed on 4-28-09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL23674.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$300.00 was made on receipt CLCL23673.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • Notice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 13-MAR-2009 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.