This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 16:25:26 (UTC).

Unifund CCR Partners v Debra Sundborg

Case Summary

On 06/28/2012 Unifund CCR Partners filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Debra Sundborg. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0712

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund CCR Partners, A New York Partnership

Defendant

Sundborg, Debra

Other

Sundborg, Debra K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miele, Kenneth J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Writ filed wholly satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly satisfied. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE297784.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $ 2,743.86. ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE296540.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 1/4/13 for plaintiff Unifund CCR Partners, a New York Partnership against defendant Debra Sundborg aka Debra K. Sundborg in the sum of: Principal: $2,211.50 Interest: $ 222.36 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 285.00 Total: $2,718.86 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Debra Sundborg aka Debra K. Sundborg hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration in support of entry of judgment re: assignment of account, account balance, interest and costs, waiver of attorney fees filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/ Judgment ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Debra Sunborg AKA Debra K. Sundborg on 08/06/12 . jv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL39563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less