This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/06/2022 at 20:14:43 (UTC).

Tracy Lee vs.Kiss Me Cosmetic Injectables

Case Summary

On 07/28/2015 Tracy Lee filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Kiss Me Cosmetic Injectables. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2384

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee, Tracy S.

Defendants

Kiss Me Cosmetic Injectables

Brubaker, Daniel B., Doctor of Osteopathi

Tesi, Karen, Registered Nurse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bell, Jason S.

Defendant Attorney

Newhouse, Trevor J

 

Court Documents

ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed

ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed; Comment: Not signed by: Jason S. Bell Party(s) who signed: Scott Foley ADR method chosen: See Attachment

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason:Dismissal previously entered on 8/31/2016

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Answer Filed

Civil Document

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

NOE.DISMISSAL.SIGNED.pdf

12/08/2016: NOE.DISMISSAL.SIGNED.pdf

Dismissal Not Entered

10/25/2016: Dismissal Not Entered

req.dismissal.executed.pdf

10/25/2016: req.dismissal.executed.pdf

Request for Dismissal

08/31/2016: Request for Dismissal

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

02/01/2016: ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed

01/28/2016: ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed

Minute Order Attachment

11/30/2015: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

11/12/2015: Case Management Statement Filed

Deposit, payment,disbursment

10/05/2015: Deposit, payment,disbursment

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Jury Both 5 - 7 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason:Dismissal previously entered on 8/31/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Full Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Lee, Tracy S.; Kiss Me Cosmetic Injectables; Brubaker, Daniel B., Doctor of Osteopathi; Tesi, Karen, Registered Nurse; Comment: With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Steven M. Vartabedian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lee, Tracy S.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00015241 Bell, Jason S. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lee, Tracy S.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: Lee, Tracy S.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Newhouse, Trevor J