This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 07:39:56 (UTC).

Tobias Teran vs. Tomas Tolusa

Case Summary

On 10/04/2016 Tobias Teran filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tomas Tolusa. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7923

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teran, Tobias

Defendant

Tolusa, Tomas

Other

All Occupants

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: **Default previously entered on 10-18-16; Judgment not entered - All DOES must be dismissed prior to enrty of judgment** (copies in tickler T)

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Default previously entered on 10/18/16. * Judgment not entered. Clerk cannot determine what type of request plaintiff is requesting.

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default; Comment: Entered as to: **Judgment not entered - Judgment form is incomplete** (copies in tickler T)

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Name: Tolusa, Tomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: If FTA, case to be Dism

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default Denied- Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: **Default previously entered on 10-18-16; Judgment not entered - All DOES must be dismissed prior to enrty of judgment** (copies in tickler T)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment No box No SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default Denied- Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Default previously entered on 10/18/16. * Judgment not entered. Clerk cannot determine what type of request plaintiff is requesting.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment no Box or SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2016
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment No box No SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial info for Teran, Tobias: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00038306 Teran, Tobias $4.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial info for Teran, Tobias: Transaction Assessment $4.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Financial info for Teran, Tobias: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00033657 Teran, Tobias $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Financial info for Teran, Tobias: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Financial: Teran, Tobias; Total Financial Assessment $244.20; Total Payments and Credits $244.20

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.