This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 23:16:27 (UTC).

Titan Insurance Company v Reed etal

Case Summary

On 11/29/2010 Titan Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Reed etal. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1704

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Titan Insurance Company

Defendant

Reed, Dwayne

Others

Reed, Dawayne

Larvell, Dawayne

Reed, Larver Dwayne

Reed, Dawayne L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Jay W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Presiding Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE313942.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Los Angeles in the amount of $3670.69. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $208.40 Interest: $691.26 Costs: $150.00 mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Writ filed partially satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed partially satisfied in the sum of $220,40 Remaining amount to satisfy this writ $ 3,549.51. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE288263.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $3498.42. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Mail Payment Moved to Trust- Comment: Payment type:check Amount: $25.00 Receipt no:CLCE287421 Payment for:writ to be issued cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0.00 Interest: $460.59 Costs: $0.00 cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Substitution of attorney filed- Comment: Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: John F. Rutan, Jr., Esq. New atty: Jay W. Smith, Esq., #150113 cg

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2011
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Dwayne Reed aka Dwayne Larvar Reed aka Dawayne Reed aka Dawayne L Reed aka Dawayne Larvell Reed on 12/12/10. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Notice filed- Comment: Notice of change of firm name filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL32628.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Financial info for Titan Insurance Company: Counter Payment Receipt # 288263 Titan Insurance Company $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Financial info for Titan Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Financial: Titan Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.