This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 23:47:46 (UTC).

Tina Fulford vs. Centex Homes / COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 Tina Fulford filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Centex Homes / COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, Diaz, Monica, Pebet, Noelle and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1451

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Diaz, Monica

Pebet, Noelle

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fulford, Tina

Vang, Jim

Alonzo, Cleofas

Vega, Starlene

Sok, Samuth

Quintanilla, Mardi

Fisher, Margaret

Vang, Holley

Quintanilla, Charles

Perez, Ricardo

Souvannasy, Phet

Arakelyan, Hovanes

Singh, Kahan

Singh, Gurpreet

Souvannasy, Sophia

Fisher, Nicholas

Lyles, John

Perez, Francisco

Alonzo, Ashley

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Centex Homes

150 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hamblin, Lauren

Fairchild, Michael K

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorney

O'Connell, Daniel M.

Other Attorneys

McElroy, Julie D.

Milionis, George K.

Louis, Lena M.

Li, Alice S.

Heller, Elliot H

Gorman, Patrick J.

Correll, Deborah A.

Murphy, Jason M.

Kirkpatrick, Cheryl A

Van Woerkom, Jon

Hebesha, Amanda G.

Pezold, Daniel G

Hatem, Robert J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint In Intervention (No Fee)

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Ken Perry Tile, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: **Order not signed, see minute order dated 11/21/19** PENDING HEARING DATE. (Proposed) Order Granting Contractors Insurance Company of America on behalf of RCR Plumbig & Mechanical, Inc. a Suspended Corporation's Leave to Intervene in This Action.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with Certificate of Mailing

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: filed by Production Framing, Inc.

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Sacramento Insulation Contractors, Inc; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (as to Defendant in 1st cross complaint)

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: **Order not signed, see minute order dated 11/21/19** PENDING HEARING DATE. (Proposed) Order Granting Contractors Insurance Company of America on behalf of DC Pro Painting INc. a Suspended Corporation's Leave to Intervene in This Action.

Notice Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Motion filed

Motion (No Fee); Comment: and Motion for Leave of Court to Intervene; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jennifer H. Carroll In Support Thereof

6/6/22 Case Management Statement

06/06/2022: 6/6/22 Case Management Statement

22 06 02 Case Management Statement.pdf

06/02/2022: 22 06 02 Case Management Statement.pdf

5-27-22 Request for Dismissal of Complaint

05/27/2022: 5-27-22 Request for Dismissal of Complaint

5/4/2022-Substitution of Attorney

05/04/2022: 5/4/2022-Substitution of Attorney

4/25/2022 Request for Dismissal

04/25/2022: 4/25/2022 Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

02/24/2022: Minute Order Attachment

2/1/22 CMC Stmt

02/01/2022: 2/1/22 CMC Stmt

12/2/21 Notice of Change of Address

12/02/2021: 12/2/21 Notice of Change of Address

Minute Order Attachment

11/15/2021: Minute Order Attachment

400 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: HRG date 6/23/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party; Names: Fulford, Tina; Vegas, Carlos; Quintanilla, Charles; Alonzo, Cleofas; Perez, Francisco; Singh, Gurpreet; Singh, Harkeshjeet; Vang, Holley; Arakelyan, Hovanes; Lyles, Irene; Morris, Jason; Vang, Jim; Lyles, John; Singh, Kahan; Quintanilla, Mardi; Fisher, Margaret; Fisher, Nicholas; Souvannasy, Phet; Perez, Ricardo; Sok, Samuth; Souvannasy, Sophia; Vega, Starlene; Alonzo, Ashley; Morris, Amy; Centex Homes; Gibson, Cynthia; Gibson, Michael; Rivera, Johana Francisco; Duque, Nancy; Johnson, Robert; Smith , Latash; Alcal Specialty Contrating, Inc; American Engineering Contractors, Inc.; B-F Glass, Inc.; Black Diamond Electric, Inc.; Blue Mountain Construction Services, Inc.; BMC West Corporation; Capital City Drywall, Inc; Central Valley Contracting Specialists, Inc.; CVC Construction Corp; Duane Coffman; Elia Painting Contractors, Inc.; Fenceworks, Inc.; Campbell, Gerry; Ideal Cabinetry, Inc; John Rocha Custom Tractor Service, Inc.; Kenyon Plastering, Inc.; M & B Carpentry, Inc.; McClure Door, Inc.; Mid Valley Masonry, Inc.; Pavletich Electric and Communications, Inc.; Petersen-Dean, Inc; Production Framing, Inc.; RCR Plumbing and Mechanical, Inc.; RSI Professional Cabinet Solutions; Sacramento Insulation Contractors, Inc.; San Joaquin Stairs, Inc.; Sherman-Loehr Custom Tile Works, Inc.; Sierra Glass and Screen, Inc.; Simas Floor Co.; Talons Landscape Development, Inc.; Walldesign Incorporated; Walltech, Inc.; Central Valley Overhead Door, Inc.; Fresno Shower Door, Inc.; Kenyon Plastering of Fresno, Inc.; Sherman-Loehr Contract Interiors, Inc.; DC Pro Painting, Inc.; Beutler Air Conditioning and Plumbing; Villara Corporation; Petersen-Dean, Inc; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment; Comment: (as to original complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Tomas V. Mazeika New Attorney: Robert J. Hatem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party; Names: CVC Construction Corp.; Zoes 1 through 50; Comment: Without Prejudice; Comment; Comment: (As to 2nd Cross Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: with clerk's certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
388 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Morris, Amy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-29683 Morris, Amy $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Morris, Amy: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Morris, Amy; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes (Judge Kimberly A. Gaab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centex Homes n/k/a Pulte Home Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Li, Alice S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Van Woerkom, Jon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HELLER, ELLIOT H