Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 04:02:36 (UTC).

Thomas S. Arviso vs Causby Arviso

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Thomas S Arviso filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Causby Arviso. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1364

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Arviso, Thomas S.

Fresno, CA 93725

Respondent

Arviso, Causby

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 11/26/13 Scanned Date: 2/12/14 lml

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to:MICROFILM SHELF/RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: CMC Off calendar. JUDGMENT SIGNED 11.26.2013/RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg- Comment: STATUS ENDS 11.26.2013/RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed./RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense- Comment: Preliminary & Final/RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 12-NOV-2013 by TFLORES.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2013
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: FLEX with Fee Waiver for processing sb 05/21/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Proof of service-summons filed- Comment: Proof of service of summons filed showing service on resp. by Mail and acknowledgment service on 03/14/13 . hgy 03/27/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 12-MAR-2013 by JCOHAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt FLCE199237.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona hgy 03/12/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _x__ No ___ Assigned to Judge RMD hgy 03/12/13 Event: Pet Disso Marr-no children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Financial info for Arviso, Thomas S.: Counter Payment Receipt # 199237 Arviso, Thomas S. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Financial info for Arviso, Thomas S.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Financial: Arviso, Thomas S.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less