Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:37:34 (UTC).

Thomas Emerzian vs. Wilsonart, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 Thomas Emerzian filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Wilsonart, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2495

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Promnitz, David A.

Dave's Custom Woodworking, Inc.

Emerzian, Thomas P.

Emerzian Woodworking, Inc.

Defendants

Wilsonart, LLC

Western Building Materials Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paboojian, Warren R.

Defendant Attorneys

Doubet, Michael Joseph

Brown, Kathleen Q.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

scanned INITIAL-CMS-1.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Opposition to Defendant Western Building Materials Co.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint

Notice Filed

scanned NTC UNAVAILABILITY KQB.pdf; Comment: of Unavailability of Counsel

Answer Filed

scanned NOM STRIKE-P&A-DEC KQB.pdf; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint; P&As Declaration of Kathleen Q. Brown - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Wilsonart, LLC

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Proceedings

Order Received for Signature

Emerzian_Wilsonart Joint Stipulation and Order.pdf; Comment: Stipulation and Order

Notice Filed

scanned DEMAND JURY-DEPOSIT JURY FEES.pdf; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees Pursuant to CCP 631b

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: re: Motion Strike

Reply filed

REPLY TO OPP TO MOTION TO STRIKE.pdf; Comment: Reply to Plaintiff's' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Western Building Materials Co.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC/CJAP Notice emailed to Plaintiff's attorney.

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • Motion - Strike- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Kathleen Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Demurrer- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Kathleen Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Motion - Strike- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Denise Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Demurrer- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Denise Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Motion - Pro Hac Vice Motion- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Denise Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: jury fee deposit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- WBMC-PROPOSED ORDER-DEMURRER.pdf; Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2019
  • Financial info for Wilsonart, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-56168 Wilsonart, LLC $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Financial info for Wilsonart, LLC: Transaction Assessment $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Financial info for Wilsonart, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-65921 Wilsonart, LLC $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Financial info for Wilsonart, LLC: Transaction Assessment $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Financial: Wilsonart, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $1,225.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Financial info for Emerzian, Thomas P.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-62366 Emerzian, Thomas P. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Financial info for Emerzian, Thomas P.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Financial info for Emerzian, Thomas P.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-39317 Emerzian, Thomas P. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Financial info for Emerzian, Thomas P.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Financial: Emerzian, Thomas P.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Emerzian Woodworking Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN BUILDING MATERIALS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paboojian, Warren R.