This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 04:13:23 (UTC).

The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut vs. Airport Specialty Products, Inc

Case Summary

On 09/07/2016 The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Airport Specialty Products, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Dalesandro, Samuel, Gaab, Kimberly and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2919

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Dalesandro, Samuel

Gaab, Kimberly

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company

The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut

Defendants

Kertel Communications Inc

DC Painting Inc

Arakelian, Inc dba Builders Flooring

Kennies Indoor Comfort Speicalist Inc

J.R Nelson Roofing Inc

Alex Ayala Electrical Contractor

Tom Besmer Construction Inc

Tri-Valley Plastering Inc

San Joaquin Stairs Inc

Kings River Door Inc

Airport Specialty Products, Inc

FG Electric Inc

Kroeker Inc

Glass Tech Inc

Spence Fence Company Enterprises

Visalia Tile Inc

Fresno Plumbing and Heating Inc

Friant Masonry Inc

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LaSalle, Robert S.

Defendant Attorneys

McElroy, Julie D.

Springel, Adam H.

Heck, Jonathan W.

 

Court Documents

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO KERTEL COMMUNICATIONS, INC. S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Peter Dekker

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Travelers Opposition to ASP's demurrer

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Friant Masonry

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: without judgment

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Request for Judical Notice

Request

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comment: Affidavit of Due Diligence

Proof of Service

Demurrer - Proof of Service .pdf; Comment: Declaration of Proof of Service by U.S. Mail

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Visalia Tile, Inc.

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: San Joaquin Stairs Inc; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: FG Electric Inc; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Kings River Door Inc; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: J.R Nelson Roofing Inc; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Friant Masonry Inc; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: A.L Drywall Inc; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Alex Ayala Electrical Contractor; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 6-15 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial info for Kertel Communications Inc: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial: Kertel Communications Inc; Total Financial Assessment $995.00; Total Payments and Credits $995.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Financial info for Airport Specialty Products, Inc: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-54384 Airport Specialty Products, Inc $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Financial info for Airport Specialty Products, Inc: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Financial: Airport Specialty Products, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-18995 The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Financial info for The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-39953 The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Financial info for The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Financial: The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less