This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:05:12 (UTC).

The State of California vs Vie-Del Company, a Nevada Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/09/2016 The State of California filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Vie-Del Company, a Nevada Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3968

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

acting by and through the State Public Works Board

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

SAN FRANCISCO AND SAN JOAQUIN VALLEY RAILWAY

VIE-DEL GRAPE PRODUCTS CO., INC., a California Corporation

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

VIE-DEL COMPANY, a Nevada Corporation

CONSOLIDATED IRRIGATION DISTRICT

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Vie-Del Grape Products Co.,Inc., a California Corporation

Consolidated Irrigation District 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Malsman, Iris

Defendant Attorney

Zamora, Mario U.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: County of Fresno; Comment: Without Prejudice

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: San Francisco and San Joaquin Valley Railway; Comment: Without Prejudice

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL COUNTY OF FRESNO

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL CONSOLIDATED IRRIGATION DISTRICT

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: 2017.08.07 Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: VIE-DEL COMPANY-Nevada

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: BNSF Railway Company; Comment: Without Prejudice

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Judge Patrick O'Hara (Ret.)

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SAN FRANCISCO AND SAN JOAQUIN

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: 2017.03.15 Answer to Complaint in Eminent Domain

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES (e-mail)

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: County of Fresno; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: San Francisco and San Joaquin Valley Railway; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Consolidated Irrigation District 1; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: BNSF Railway Company; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Jury Both; 5 to 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:37 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Judge Patrick O'Hara (Ret.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • Financial info for Vie-Del Grape Products Co.,Inc., a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Financial: Vie-Del Grape Products Co.,Inc., a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Financial info for Vie-Del Company, a Nevada Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-01011 Vie-Del Company, a Nevada Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Financial info for Vie-Del Company, a Nevada Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Financial: Vie-Del Company, a Nevada Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Financial info for The State Of California: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00002738 Legal Support Network, LLC $27.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Financial info for The State Of California: Transaction Assessment $27.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Financial info for The State Of California: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Financial info for The State Of California: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Financial: The State Of California; Total Financial Assessment $462.50; Total Payments and Credits $462.50

    Read MoreRead Less