This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 05:39:38 (UTC).

The State of California vs.J.G. Mulligan

Case Summary

On 08/24/2015 The State of California filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against J G Mulligan. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Black, Donald, Cullers, Mark, Gamoian, Lisa and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2668

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Black, Donald

Cullers, Mark

Gamoian, Lisa

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The State of California

Defendants

Mulligan, J.G.

The Heirs and Devisees of J.G. Mulligan

Mulligan, George

Brokaw, Jane

DOE 8

DOE 12

Hardaway, Susan

DOE 2

DOE 7

Salulacich, Bill

Doe 1

Mulligan, Patrick

Mulligan, Lou

Essick, Janet

Doe 6

Doe 10

DOE 5

Mulligan, John

Saulacich, Joan

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ohanian, Sevana Z

Defendant Attorney

Mulligan, Susan Z.

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: As to Jean Mulligan Saulacich- No proof of service filed.

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: as to Patrick Mulligan - Proof of Service Defective.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - Patrick Mulligan-NO ACTION TAKEN PER DISMISSAL FILED ON 02/09/2017

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Manal H. Pelch RE:Order to Show Cause RE: FAilure to Appear at CMC

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: publication of summons and notice of motion for order for possession

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: as to The Heirs and Devisees of J.G. Mulligan, Deceased, and All Persons Claiming By, Through or Under Said Decedent - Previously entered on 3/3/2017.

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default; Comment: as to Timothy Mulligan - Proof of Service Defective.

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - Lou Mulligan; NO ACTION TAKEN PER DISMISSAL 2/9/17

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - Joan Saulacich; NO ACTION TAKEN PER DISMISSAL 2/9/17

Notice Filed

Proof of Service; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgemnt of Receipt of Proof of Service on Janet Essick-No Action taken defendant dismissed on 02/09/2017

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Sevana Ohanian RE: Order to Show Cause RE: Failure to Appear at CMC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: The State of California; The Heirs and Devisees of J.G. Mulligan; Mulligan, Timothy; Mulligan, Patrick; Lindberg, Kathleen; Mulligan, Michael; Mulligan, Lou; Hardaway, Susan; Brokaw, Jane; Essick, Janet; Comment: DISMISSAL SET ASIDE PER MINUTE ORDER 4/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default Denied- Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: as to Joan Saulacich, Proof of service did not specify as Doe 12 Defendant. Proof of service filed on 4-11-17 is DEFECTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default Denied- Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: as to Jane Brokaw, Proof of service did not specify as Doe 9 Defendant. Proof of service filed on 4-11-17 is DEFECTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default Received- Request for Entry of Default; Comment: PENDING REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default Received- Request for Entry of Default; Comment: PENDING REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default Denied- Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: As to Janet Essick - Duplicate request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default Denied- Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: As to Susan Mulligan - No proof of service filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • Financial info for Mulligan, Timothy: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00037287 State of California $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Financial info for Mulligan, Timothy: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Financial: Mulligan, Timothy; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Financial info for The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Financial info for The State of California: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Financial info for The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Financial info for The State of California: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for The State of California: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial: The State of California; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.