This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 10:16:03 (UTC).

The State of California vs.Vie-Del Company

Case Summary

On 10/25/2016 The State of California filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Vie-Del Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Dalesandro, Samuel and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3449

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the State Public Works Board

The State of California

Defendants

DEL MONTE CORPORATION, a New York Corporation

VIE-DEL GRAPE PRODUCTS, CO., INC.

VIE-DEL COMPANY, a Nevada Corporation

J.R. HAWTHORN AND THOS. MARTIN

Doe 1

Vie-Del Company

Vie-Del Grape Producits, Co., Inc.

Del Monte Foods

Martin, Thos

Hawthorn, J.R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Malsman, Iris

Defendant Attorney

Zamora, Mario U.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Del Monte Corporation, a New York Corporation; Comment: Without Prejudice

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: AMENDED COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: 2017.08.09 Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Disclaimer of Interest

Notice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service on VIE-DEL COMPANY

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: 2017.02.06 Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

Order Received for Signature

Application; Comment: PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 503 Order for : Application to Amend Complaint-Doe 1 Forwarded to 4th Floor Clerk's office for further processing

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: to Amend Complaint and File First Amended Complaint in Eminent Domain.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal - JR Hawthorn and THOS

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal - DEL MONTE CORP

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Partial Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Del Monte Corporation, a New York Corporation; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Hawthorn, J.R.; Martin, Thos; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 3-5 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Document Filed- Amended Document Filed; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Document Filed- Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: AMENDED COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: to Amend Complaint and File First Amended Complaint in Eminent Domain.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Government Exemption Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2016
  • Financial info for Vie-Del Company: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-05969 VIE-DEL COMPANY, a Nevada Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Financial info for Vie-Del Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Financial: Vie-Del Company; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Financial info for The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Financial info for The State of California: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $29.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for The State of California: Transaction Assessment $29.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Financial info for The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Financial info for The State of California: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Financial: The State of California; Total Financial Assessment $484.50; Total Payments and Credits $484.50

    Read MoreRead Less