This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 10:53:14 (UTC).

The State of California vs. Pasquale DeSantis

Case Summary

On 01/19/2017 The State of California filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Pasquale DeSantis. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, McGuire, Rosemary, Snauffer, Mark, Diaz, Monica, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Gaab, Kimberly, Simpson, Alan, Black, Donald and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0192

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

McGuire, Rosemary

Snauffer, Mark

Diaz, Monica

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

Simpson, Alan

Black, Donald

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The State of California, acting by and through the State Public Works Board

The High-Speed Rail Authority

The State of California

Defendants

DeSantis, Pasquale

M-N-M Shear & Clipper Cuts

Koligian, Alice L

successor in interest to Title Insurance and Trust Company

DeSantis, Carmela

Squire Liquors

Suburban Trousseau, LLC

Lakhvinder, Paul

North West 99 Cent Discounted

City Suds Laundromat

Botanica Tesoro Mistico

Hinojosa Hernandez, Raul

Ticor Title Company of California

Trustees of The DeSantis Family Trust Dated August 13, 2003

County of Fresno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hill, Roderick D.

Defendant Attorney

Cummings, Charles D.

 

Court Documents

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: TBD

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: withdrawal of deposit of probable amount of just compensation

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service Mail-Civil/Pasquale DeSantis

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: *PENDING REVIEW UNTIL HEARING*

Disclaimer of Interest

Brief

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Alice Koligian

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: For possession

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: *PENDING REVIEW UNTIL HEARING*

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: PENDING HEARING DATE Proposed Order for Possession

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: -Raul Hinojosa Hernandez dba North West 99 Cent Discount

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: To Complaint; 1st Appearance

Disclaimer of Interest

Notice

Notice Filed

Application/Request; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; DeSantis, Pasquale; DeSantis, Carmela; Judgment Amount: $90,000.00; Awarded Against:; The State of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Party Names: The State of California; Hinojosa Hernandez, Raul; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Hinojosa Hernandez, Raul; Judgment Amount: $15,000.00; Awarded Against:; The State of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Order filed; Comment: final order of condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Letter previously efiled 7/25/2019; Final Order of Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter Received- Letter Received; Comment: re: Final Order of Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded the clerks office for further processing on 07.31.19** PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept.503 Order for : Final Order of Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- 2863070_87419719DeSa; Comment: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
128 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • Financial info for DeSantis, Pasquale: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-47098 DeSantis, Pasquale $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Financial info for DeSantis, Pasquale: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial info for DeSantis, Pasquale: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-01369 DeSantis, Pasquale $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Financial info for DeSantis, Pasquale: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Financial: DeSantis, Pasquale; Total Financial Assessment $578.00; Total Payments and Credits $578.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Financial info for The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Financial info for The State of California: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Financial info for The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $28.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Financial info for The State of California: Transaction Assessment $28.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Financial: The State of California; Total Financial Assessment $88.00; Total Payments and Credits $88.00

    Read MoreRead Less