This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:14:21 (UTC).

The State of California vs.Kraig Carter

Case Summary

On 12/12/2016 The State of California filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Kraig Carter. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3991

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The State of California, acting by and through the State Public Works Board

acting by and through the State Public Works Board

The State of California

Defendants

Carter, Natalie Ruth

Kingsburg Orchards, Inc.

Jackson, Michael G.

Carter, Kirk Wallace

Carter, Kraig Vincent

Carter, Gail West

Jackson, Lori R

Carter, H. Vincent

Mendoza, Jose

Mike Jackson Farms

Trustee of the Vincent and Gail Carter Living Trust, dated April 22, 1997

as Trustee of the Harold Vincent Carter Trust created August 4, 1997

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carroll, Joseph P

Defendant Attorneys

Campagne, Justin T.

Wasser, Mark A

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Jan Kahn New Attorney: Justin Champagne Bar#211825

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Request Filed

Request; Comment: Request for Entry of Default

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Plaintiff's Demand for Exchange of Information

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: *PENDING REVIEW*

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of JORGE GRANADOS in support of motion for possession

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: for possession

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - Kirk Wallace Carter

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Defendants' Demand for Exchange of Valuation Data and List of Expert Witnesses

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: (Order signed; Forwarded to clerks office for further processing) Forwarded to: Dept. 403 Order for: Possession

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: in Support of An Order for Possession

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: JUry Both; 5 to 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: Defendants' Demand for Exchange of Valuation Data and List of Expert Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: Plaintiff's Demand for Exchange of Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: Jury Both; 5 to 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial: Carter, Natalie Ruth; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Financial info for Carter, Kirk Wallace: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-00490 Carter, Kraig Vincent $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial info for Carter, Kirk Wallace: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial: Carter, Kirk Wallace; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Financial info for Carter, Kraig Vincent: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-00489 Carter, Kraig Vincent $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial info for Carter, Kraig Vincent: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial: Carter, Kraig Vincent; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial info for The State of California: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00010260 The State of California, acting by and through the State Public Works Board $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial info for The State of California: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial: The State of California; Total Financial Assessment $150.00; Total Payments and Credits $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.