This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 13:53:07 (UTC).

The State of Califonia vs James Critchley

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 The State of Califonia filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against James Critchley. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Diaz, Monica, Snauffer, Mark and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0606

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Diaz, Monica

Snauffer, Mark

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The State of Califonia, acting by and through the State Public Works Board

The State of Califonia

acting by and through the High-Speed Rail Authority

Defendants

Critchley, Scott C.

Critchley, James B.

Nash Dairy Company, a California limited partnership

J.B. Critchley, Inc.

Jones, Clifford D.

as Trustee of the James B. Critchley Revocable Trust of December 14, 2007

as Trustee of the Scott C. Critchley Revocable Trust of April 18, 2007

Jones, Joyce F.

NASH FARMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Einhorn, Michael A.G

Defendant Attorney

Wasser, Mark A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: JB Critchley, Inc.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Joyce Jones

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: civil case cover sheet

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default; Comment: Denied as to James B. Critchley, Scott Critchley, and JB Critchley Inc, re: Answer filed on 4/13/17

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: demand for exchange of information

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: to Complaint

Request Filed

Request; Comment: Defendants' Demand for Exchange of Valuation Data and List of Expert Witnesses

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Clifford Jones

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: TBD

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: complaint in eminent domain

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: summons (for complaint)

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Nash Dairy Company

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Association of Attorney filed

Association of Attorney/Counsel

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 501 Order for: Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Application Filed- Ex Parte Application; Comment: to Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Deposit, payment,disbursment- Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: payment of preliminary jury fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Filed- Stipulation; Comment: Stipulation to Extend Date of Exchange of Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Motion - Compel X3/Motion - set aside judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Motion - Compel- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Michael Einhorn

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • Financial: Critchley, James B.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Financial info for The State of Califonia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-57842 The State of Califonia $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Financial info for The State of Califonia: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Financial info for The State of Califonia: Fee Waiver $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Financial info for The State of Califonia: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Financial info for The State of Califonia: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00008942 The State of Califonia, acting by and through the State Public Works Board $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Financial info for The State of Califonia: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Financial info for The State of Califonia: Government Exemption Claimed $28.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Financial info for The State of Califonia: Transaction Assessment $28.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Financial: The State of Califonia; Total Financial Assessment $388.00; Total Payments and Credits $388.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.