This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 05:29:27 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 08/21/2015 XXXXX was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2645

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of The State of California

Defendants

Doss, Adam

Adam Doss and Sheldon Doss Partnership, a Calif general partnership

Quality College Vocational Careers

County Bank

Fidelity National Title Company

Rich Doss Inc.

Cen Cal Business Finance Group, a Corporation

Sterling Savings Bank

Edwards, Lonney D.

husband and wife as joint tenants

UPF Incorporated

First American Title Company

U.S. Small Business Adminstration

Edwards, Omega M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Corral, Jesus

Defendant Attorneys

Peterson, John S.

Lazar, George C

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: protective order re: documents produced during discovery

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Protective Order; Comment: Order signed and issued. FF to clerks office 05/25/2017, for further processing. Forwarded to Dept 402 Stipulation and Protective Order

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: for Order For Possession

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of Notice of Deposit and Summary mailed on 10/21/2015 to C/O CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Jury Fees Collected

Civil Document; Comment: by Jesus Corral for The State of California

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Quality College Vocational Careers; Comment: Without Prejudice

Order Received for Signature

Judgment; Comment: Judgment signed and issued. Forwarded to clerks office 03/08/2018, for further processing. Forwarded to Dept:402 Order for: Judgment In Condemnation

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 225 on July 30, 2018 at 1:00 PM in Conference Room 305

Conditional Settlement Reached

Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date:June 1, 2018

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: for withdrawal of deposit of probable compensation

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: For Possession

Opposition filed

Opposition filed; Comment: to Motion for Prejudment Possession

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Deposit and summary of the basis for the appraisal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Quality College Vocational Careers; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Judgment; Comment: Judgment signed and issued. Forwarded to clerks office 03/08/2018, for further processing. Forwarded to Dept:402 Order for: Judgment In Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Filed- Stipulation; Comment: Stipulation for Judgment in Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Jury Both 5 - 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 225 on July 30, 2018 at 1:00 PM in Conference Room 305

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2015
  • Financial info for Adam Doss and Sheldon Doss Partnership, a Calif general partnership: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00028974 San luis $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Financial info for Adam Doss and Sheldon Doss Partnership, a Calif general partnership: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Financial: Adam Doss and Sheldon Doss Partnership, a Calif general partnership; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Financial info for The People of The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Financial info for The People of The State of California: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Financial info for The People of The State of California: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00022476 Corral, Jesus $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Financial info for The People of The State of California: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Financial info for The People of The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Financial info for The People of The State of California: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Financial: The People of The State of California; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.