This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 15:46:31 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Victoria Marie Gomez

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Victoria Marie Gomez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0337

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Gomez, Victoria Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 0 Actual: 0 GTWT: 0 Treatment: 0); Fee Totals ; ; $0.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $0.00; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 10/01/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/30/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 11/30/2018; Start Time: 7:00 PM; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 364 Days; Suspended: 334 Days; Suspended Reason: Referred to Adult Offender Work Program; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; Comment: Install or obtain exemption from DMV with in 90 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Previously Sentenced

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Text:- Comment: VACATE-Jury Trial 10/2/2018 in Department 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Probation Revocation Advisement pursuant to PC 1202.44- Comment: Amount: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: C. Rohan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: J. Orr Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:28 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Department 97A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency:Fresno Police Department Citation #:E0355336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Financial info for Gomez, Victoria Marie: Transaction Assessment $2174.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Financial: Gomez, Victoria Marie; Total Financial Assessment $0.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less