This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 12:06:21 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Ricardo Anthony Lee Castillo

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Ricardo Anthony Lee Castillo. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Peterson, Dennis and Kelley, James A, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8773

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Peterson, Dennis

Kelley, James A, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Castillo, Ricardo Anthony Lee

Castillo, Richad Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Alternate Defense Office

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Peterson, Dennis; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal in light of violation admission in F14907745-1B Oral/Written: Written

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: J. Conklin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant appearing without counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Motion - Dismiss- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Continuance Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: S Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Alternate Defense Office appearing on behalf of Defendant- Comment: Attorney: L Boyd Defendant present : Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Attorney conflict; new counsel appointed- Comment: It appearing there is an attorney conflict. New counsel is appointed. Attorney appointed: Alternate Defense Office Reason: Conflict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 2:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Peterson, Dennis; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Dept. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less