This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 11:58:15 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Ravinder Singh Randhawa

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Ravinder Singh Randhawa. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nunez, Ralph and Kams, Timothy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8876

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nunez, Ralph

Kams, Timothy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Randhawa, Ravinder Singh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Escamilla, Eric

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Fee Totals ; Due: 11/05/2018; ; $1,895.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,945.00; Programs; Attend and Complete (SB38) 18 Month Alcohol Program; Ordered; Order Date: 09/18/2018; Comment: within 30 days; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 09/18/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/17/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 11/16/2018; Start Time: 7:00 PM; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 180 Days; Suspended: 170 Days; Suspended Reason: Referred to Adult Offender Work Program; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol; BAC Level: 0.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2018
  • Web Payment Reviewed and Confirmed- Comment: Receipt #:WEB-2018-90131 Confirmation #:289861 Amount paid: $1,845.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Web Payment Reviewed and Confirmed- Comment: Receipt #:WEB-2018-83361 Confirmation #:283720 Amount paid: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Defendant Released on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Court orders Alcohol Assessment Program fee purs to VC 23649- Comment: Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • $4.00 EMAT Fee pursuant to AB 2173 to the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Criminal Conviction Fee purs.to GC 70373 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Dept. 97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Prosecution indicates defendant has prior DUI conviction(s).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Fingerprint on Back of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno Police Department Citation #: 2268551

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2018
  • Financial info for Randhawa, Ravinder Singh: Web Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-90131 Randhawa, Ravinder Singh $1845.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Financial info for Randhawa, Ravinder Singh: Web Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-83361 Randhawa, Ravinder Singh $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Financial info for Randhawa, Ravinder Singh: Transaction Assessment $1945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Financial: Randhawa, Ravinder Singh; Total Financial Assessment $1,945.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,945.00

    Read MoreRead Less