This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 12:02:09 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Raquel Colmenero Douglas

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Raquel Colmenero Douglas. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Gallagher, John and Idiart, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8782

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Gallagher, John

Idiart, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Douglas, Raquel Colmenero

Douglas, Raquel Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ciummo & Associates

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Idiart, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Defendant released on this case only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismiss Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: A. Christopherson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Ciummo and Associates appearing on behalf of Defendant- Comment: Attorney: N. Nekaumanesh Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Idiart, Michael; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Defendant remains in custody at Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Continuance to trail felony Violation of Probation Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: R. Allein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: D. Mosley and A. Lassen Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 1:35 PM; 1:54 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less