This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 12:56:25 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Randy Alan Taber

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Randy Alan Taber. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chittick, Hilary and Gottlieb, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9099

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chittick, Hilary

Gottlieb, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Taber, Randy

Taber, Randy Alan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Gottlieb, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts- Comment: On this case only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal. Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: S. Ueltzen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: D. Moshier Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Gottlieb, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.