This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 16:10:03 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Ramiro Eliceo Reyna

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Ramiro Eliceo Reyna. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nunez, Ralph and Allen-Hill, Glenda. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0411

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nunez, Ralph

Allen-Hill, Glenda

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Reyna, Ramiro Eliceo

Reyna, Ramiro Eliseo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Defender, Public

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Allen-Hill, Glenda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • The remaining counts and allegations have been dismissed- Comment: Reserving the right to comment and request restitution as to this case only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts- Comment: On this case only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismiss in light of admission to F17904698. Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: M. Marsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: S. Bullock Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Allen-Hill, Glenda; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2018
  • Warrant Ordered Issued- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: $12,000.00 Conditions: Night Service -No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Court orders Defendant Cite status revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: 3:25 PM Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 3:25 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Fingerprint on Back of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno Police Department Citation #: 2253319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less