This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/22/2019 at 18:57:56 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Ralph Solorio

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Ralph Solorio. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Hoff, Gary, Chittick, Hilary and Ellison, Wayne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9281

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Hoff, Gary

Chittick, Hilary

Ellison, Wayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Solorio, Ralph, JR

Solorio, Ralph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Modification; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 4 Actual: 2 GTWT: 2 Treatment: 0); Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 08/14/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/13/2022; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 02/14/2020; Start Time: 6:45 PM; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 10 Days; Suspended: 0 Day; Suspended Reason: Re-Referred to Adult Offender Work Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 4 Actual:2 GTWT:2 Treatment: 0); Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 08/14/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/13/2022; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 10/11/2019; Start Time: 6:45 PM; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 10 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Ellison, Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Ellison, Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • HearingDefendant remains on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • HearingDefendant referred/re-referred to program- Comment: Referral/Re-referral: Re-Referral Program: AOWP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • HearingReport to ACTION Center- Comment: Report by: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • HearingJail Imposed

    Read MoreRead Less
173 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2018
  • HearingWarrant Ordered Issued- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: $2,000.00 Conditions: Night Service - No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • HearingSurety Bond Forfeited- Comment: Bond Number: SV5-4908878

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • HearingCase having been called at- Comment: Time: 11:08 AM Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • HearingProceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:08 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • HearingArraignment- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: D97A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • HearingHearing - Missing Complaint- Judicial Officer: Hoff, Gary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • HearingCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • HearingJUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • HearingCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • HearingSurety Bond Posted- Comment: Bond Number: SV5-4908878

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.