This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 13:39:56 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Quincy Lamon Ivy

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Quincy Lamon Ivy. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Penner, Don, Nunez, Ralph and Gallagher, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9553

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Penner, Don

Nunez, Ralph

Gallagher, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Ivy, Quincy Lamon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

City Attorney's Office

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Penner, Don

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Clerk's Office sends JUS 8715 subsequent to D.O.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • The Court Orders the Clerk's Office to notify the Elections- Comment: Office of restoration of voting rights pursuant to EC 2211.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Order to lift the prohibition of a firearm- Comment: Reported to the DOJ-Bureau of Firearms.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Case Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Defendant released on this case only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Dismiss Count(s)- Comment: 001 - Motion of People. Right to comment and Request restitution is reserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitted by: City Attorney. Type of motion: Dismiss in Light of Plea on Case# F18904239. Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • Defendant's presence waived pursuant to PC 977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: E. Mehling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: C. Chang Defendant Present: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 10:56am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Per PD T. Gill request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Fingerprint on Back of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno Police Department Citation #: 2265449

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Charging Document - Will Prosecute Filed

    Read MoreRead Less