This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/13/2019 at 06:19:48 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Michael Hernandez

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Michael Hernandez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whitehead, Denise and Kapetan, Jon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8878

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whitehead, Denise

Kapetan, Jon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Hernandez, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Fee Totals ; Due: 02/01/2019; ; $1,895.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,945.00; Programs; Attend and Complete 3 Month Level 1 Alcohol Program; Ordered; Order Date: 10/31/2018; Comment: by 11/16/2018; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 10/31/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/30/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 12/28/2018; Start Time: 6:45 PM; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 2 Days; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol; BAC Level: 0.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Probation Hearing - Violation of Probation Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: D.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Proof of Program filed- Comment: NOTICE OF COMPLETION Program: 3 MOP DUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Calendar Setting- Comment: Hearing Type: VOPA Hearing Date: 05/21/19 Department: 13 Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Defendant failed to complete:- Comment: DECISIONS FOR LIFE 1/9/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Proof of Program filed- Comment: ENROLLED 12/10/18 Program:03 MOP DUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Court Orders Clerk's Office to refer defendant to- Comment: Program: 03 MOP DUI DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 10:11 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Fingerprint on Back of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno Police Department Citation #: 2258031

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Michael: Transaction Assessment $1945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Financial: Hernandez, Michael; Total Financial Assessment $1,945.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less