This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/03/2019 at 14:04:31 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Michael Anthony Jaquez, JR

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Michael Anthony Jaquez, JR. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chittick, Hilary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8861

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chittick, Hilary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Jaquez, Michael Anthony

Jaquez, Michael Anthony, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Probation Violated, Revoked, and/or Reinstated With Sent Mod; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total:28 Actual:14 GTWT:14 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 12/8/18); Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 44 Actual: 22 GTWT: 22 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 04/25/2019); Probation; Type: Prop 36 Probation - PC 1210.1; Start Date: 06/26/2018; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 12/11/2020; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 38 Days; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 44 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total:28 Actual:14 GTWT:14 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 12/8/18); Probation; Type: Prop 36 Probation - PC 1210.1; Start Date: 06/26/2018; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 09/17/2020; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 38 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Probation Violated, Revoked, and/or Reinstated With Sent Mod; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total:28 Actual:14 GTWT:14 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 12/8/18); Probation; Type: Prop 36 Probation - PC 1210.1; Start Date: 06/26/2018; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 09/16/2020; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 38 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 8 Actual: 4 GTWT: 4 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 06/26/2018); Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 17 Actual: 9 GTWT: 8 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 10/15/2018); Probation; Type: Prop 36 Probation - PC 1210.1; Start Date: 06/26/2018; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 09/16/2020; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 8 Days; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 17 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 8 Actual: 4 GTWT: 4 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 06/26/2018); Probation; Type: Prop 36 Probation - PC 1210.1; Start Date: 06/26/2018; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 06/25/2020; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 8 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 8 Actual: 4 GTWT: 4 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 06/26/2018); Probation; Type: Prop 36 Probation - PC 1210.1; Start Date: 06/26/2018; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 06/25/2020; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 8 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Defendant released on Credit For Time Served

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • Court orders Defendant Cite status revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: 9:49am Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:49am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Per District Attorney defendant is eligible for PC1000- Comment: Pretrial Drug Diversion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Per District Attorney, defendant is eligible for Prop 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno County Sheriff-Coroner's Office Citation #: 523455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less