This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 12:05:05 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Marisol Avalos

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Marisol Avalos. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Vogt, John, Orozco, Gary and Nunez, Ralph. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8791

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Vogt, John

Orozco, Gary

Nunez, Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Avalos, Marisol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ciummo & Associates

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Vogt, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Disposition: Plea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation- Comment: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Orozco, Gary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court Order; Comment: vacate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Dismissal Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: F Zarea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Ciummo and Associates appearing on behalf of Defendant- Comment: Attorney: E. Morgan Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Own Recognizance Release Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: A. Guillermo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Ciummo and Associates appearing on behalf of Defendant- Comment: Attorney: Kojo Moore Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Attorney conflict; new counsel appointed- Comment: It appearing there is an attorney conflict. New counsel is appointed. Attorney appointed: Ciummo and Associates Reason: Conflict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 2:30 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Arraignment- Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: D2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less