This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 13:23:59 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Marina Louise Brady

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Marina Louise Brady. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whitehead, Denise and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9392

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whitehead, Denise

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Brady, Marina Louise

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Defender, Public

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 0 Actual: 0 GTWT: 0 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 10/19/2018); Fee Totals ; Due: 11/01/2018; ; $1,895.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,945.00; Programs; Attend and Complete (SB38) 18 Month Alcohol Program; Ordered; Order Date: 10/09/2018; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 10/09/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/09/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 10/09/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 20 Days; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; Habitual Offender; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol; BAC Level: 0.09; Comment: Defendant to install Ignition Interlock Device or obtain exemption from the Department of Motor Vehicles by 10/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Web Payment Reviewed and Confirmed- Comment: Receipt #:WEB-2018-87926 Confirmation #:287793 Amount paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Web Payment Reviewed and Confirmed- Comment: Receipt #:WEB-2018-79848 Confirmation #:280232 Amount paid: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Court Orders Clerk's Office to refer defendant to- Comment: Program: 18 MOP DUI SSCC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Jail Psychiatric Services/ Medical Services may be needed- Comment: The court has been informed that Jail Medical Services may be needed for the defendant. Reason: Medication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Defendant remanded into custody- Comment: Bail Set at NO BAIL Convicted: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Court orders Alcohol Assessment Program fee purs to VC 23649- Comment: Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency:Fresno Police Department Citation #:E0351385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Financial info for Brady, Marina Louise: Web Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-87926 Brady, Marina Louise $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Financial info for Brady, Marina Louise: Web Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-79848 Brady, Marina Louise $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Financial info for Brady, Marina Louise: Counter Payment Receipt # MISD-2018-00004473 Brady, Marina Louise $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Financial info for Brady, Marina Louise: Transaction Assessment $1945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Financial: Brady, Marina Louise; Total Financial Assessment $1,945.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less