This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/06/2019 at 05:47:25 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Magdaleno Jasso

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Magdaleno Jasso. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chittick, Hilary and Penner, Don. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8887

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chittick, Hilary

Penner, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Jasso, Magdaleno

Jasso, Magdaleno Montano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Department 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Warrant Abstract Filed- Comment: Issue Date:8/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency:Fresno Police Department Citation #:2289770

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Warrant Issued- Comment: Type:Arrest Amount: $500 Conditions:None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant reviewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Penner, Don; Hearing Time: 6:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Agency to provide Affidavit in Support of Arrest Warrant- Comment: Court orders the following agency to file an Affidavit in Support of Arrest Warrant: District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: T. Eilers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: 11:02 am Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:02 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Fingerprint on Back of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency:Fresno Police Department Citation #:2261862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less