Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/29/2019 at 07:51:49 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Lorenzo Morales Barboza

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Lorenzo Morales Barboza. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chittick, Hilary, Whitehead, Denise, Ellison, Wayne, Corona, Adolfo and Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9259

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chittick, Hilary

Whitehead, Denise

Ellison, Wayne

Corona, Adolfo

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Barboza, Lorenzo Morales, JR

Barboza, Lorenzo Morales

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Defender, Public

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Corona, Adolfo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Defendant released on this case only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Court Type of Motion: Dismissal of Case Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Criminal proceedings reinstated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Court finds Defendant is not competent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Court Read and Considered- Comment: Document: Report and Recommendation from Dr. Velosa

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • Warrant Activated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Warrant Ordered Issued- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: $500.00 Conditions: Night Service - No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Court orders Defendant Cite status revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: 11:07 am Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:07 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Clovis Police Department Citation #:2018050616465652

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less