This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/06/2019 at 07:03:07 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Lawrence Toaloc Rocha

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Lawrence Toaloc Rocha. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen-Hill, Glenda. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9156

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Allen-Hill, Glenda

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Rocha, Lawrence

Rocha, Lawrence Toaloc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ciummo & Associates

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 9 Actual: 5 GTWT: 4 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 06/06/2018); Fee Totals ; Due: 08/05/2018; ; $220.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $270.00; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 06/06/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 06/05/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 90 Days; Suspended: 81 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Plea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant Released on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Restitution reserved- Comment: The Court reserves jurisdiction over the issue of restitution to be paid to victim(s).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Criminal Conviction Fee purs.to GC 70373 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Court Operations Fee purs. to PC 1465.8 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • The following fees are not a condition of Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • Attorney conflict; new counsel appointed- Comment: It appearing there is an attorney conflict. New counsel is appointed. Attorney appointed: Ciummo and Associates Reason: Conflict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:43 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Sentencing- Judicial Officer: Allen-Hill, Glenda; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Allen-Hill, Glenda; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: D2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Per District Attorney defendant may be eligible for Prop 63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Financial info for Rocha, Lawrence Toaloc: Transaction Assessment $270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Financial: Rocha, Lawrence Toaloc; Total Financial Assessment $270.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.