This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/12/2019 at 07:38:18 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Latoya Nicole Rector

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Latoya Nicole Rector. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chittick, Hilary and Nunez, Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9093

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chittick, Hilary

Nunez, Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Rector, Latoya Nicole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • Warrant Activated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Warrant Ordered Issued- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: $1,000.00 Conditions: Night Service - No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Court orders Defendant Cite status revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 3:21 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Warrant Abstract Filed- Comment: Issue Date: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno PD Citation #: 2271424

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Warrant Activated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Warrant Ordered Issued- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: $1000.00 Conditions: Night Service - No

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Own recognizance release and continue to department 97B Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: T. Eilers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: A. Carasso/T. Kelly Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 10:04 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: D11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.