This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/11/2020 at 05:05:49 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Landon Tyler Brock

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Landon Tyler Brock. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whitehead, Denise and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9164

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whitehead, Denise

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Brock, Landon Tyler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Makasian, James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Brock, Landon Tyler: Mail Payment Receipt # PC-2019-00020040 Michael Der Manouel M.D. Manouel Insurance Personal Account $1945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketJUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 2 Actual: 2 GTWT: 0 Treatment: 0); Fee Totals ; Due: 11/15/2019; ; $1,895.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,945.00; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 08/28/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/27/2022; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 180 Days; Stayed: 178 Days; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol and Drugs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Brock, Landon Tyler: Transaction Assessment $1945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Brock, Landon Tyler; Total Financial Assessment $1,945.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDefendant Released on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCourt order Alcohol Assessment Program fee purs. to VC 23649- Comment: Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docket$4.00 EMAT Fee pursuant to AB 2173

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: H. Bertrando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketPrivate Counsel appearing on behalf of the Defendant- Comment: Attorney: J. Makasian Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketAttorney of Record set- Comment: Attorney: J. Makasian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketProceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:07 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketArraignment- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued Upon Court's Own Motion; Comment: Dept. 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketFingerprint on Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCitation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno County Detention Facility Citation #: S110453

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.