This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 12:54:45 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Kyrone Jaray Haygood

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Kyrone Jaray Haygood. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kapetan, Jon and Whitehead, Denise. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9144

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kapetan, Jon

Whitehead, Denise

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Haygood, Kyrone Jaray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Defender, Public

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 08/27/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/27/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Time: 7:00 PM; Concurrent: run concurrent to count 001; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 10 Days; Suspended: 0 Day; Suspended Reason: Referred to SCRAMX; Comment: defendant is on SCRAM-X now; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; Comment: install IID or obtain exemption from DMV by 09/07/2018; Fee Totals ; Due: 11/01/2018; ; $0.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 13 Actual: 4 GTWT: 4 Treatment: 5); Programs; Attend and Complete (SB38) 18 Month Alcohol Program; Ordered; Order Date: 08/27/2018; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 08/27/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/27/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Time: 7:00 PM; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 120 Days; Suspended: 0 Day; Suspended Reason: Referred to SCRAMX; Comment: defendant is on SCRAM-X now; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol; BAC Level: 0.19; Fee Totals ; Due: 11/01/2018; ; $1,895.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Defendant provided proof- Comment: Proof: SCRAMX installation Count(s): 001, 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Text:- Comment: Payments are to be made in installments at the following rate of $35.00 monthly starting on the date of Thursday, November 1, 2018 until paid off in full as to the following case(s): M18919144. Installment fee in the amount of $50.00 to be assessed to the balance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Court orders- Comment: Defendant may be allowed to attend court hearings regarding their child. Defendant to provide minute order to SCRAM-X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Defendant Released on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Fines/Fees suspended as to count(s)- Comment: Fine amount: $1,444.00 Count(s): 003

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant reviewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Kapetan, Jon; Hearing Time: 6:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Prosecution indicates defendant has prior DUI conviction(s).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Complaint Filed at Counter - No Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Financial info for Haygood, Kyrone Jaray: Transaction Assessment $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Financial info for Haygood, Kyrone Jaray: Transaction Assessment $1945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Financial: Haygood, Kyrone Jaray; Total Financial Assessment $1,945.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.