This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 13:01:16 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Kieanna Breann Manning

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Kieanna Breann Manning. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hoff, Gary and Nunez, Ralph. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9160

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hoff, Gary

Nunez, Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Manning, Kieanna Breann

Manning, Kienna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Defender, Public

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Surety Bond Exoneration Notice Sent- Comment: Bond Number: SV10-4896492

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Surety Bond Exonerated- Comment: Bond Number: SV10-4896492

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: E. Mehling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: J. Newcomb Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • Special appearance by Attorney- Comment: Attorney: J. Newcomb-Friend of the court Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:56 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: D97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Hearing - Missing Complaint- Judicial Officer: Hoff, Gary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Room 401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • District Attorney Letter Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Surety Bond Posted- Comment: Bond Number: SV10-4896492

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Hearing - Missing Complaint- Judicial Officer: Hoff, Gary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error; Comment: Room 401

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.