This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 13:06:04 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Kelly Earl Cox

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Kelly Earl Cox. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whitehead, Denise, Kelley, James A, JR, Gallagher, John and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9138

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whitehead, Denise

Kelley, James A, JR

Gallagher, John

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Cox, Kelly Earl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

GREEN, ERIC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Defendant remains in custody at Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Defendant ordered to be present at next hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Defendant waived statutory time- Comment: Hearing Type: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Case to trail another case- Comment: Case number: F18905824

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Continuance to trail. Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: A. Janz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Private Counsel appearing on behalf of the Defendant- Comment: Attorney: Eric Green Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Dept. 13 Add on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Defendant Arrested, Abstract Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Warrant Issued- Comment: Type:Arrest Amount: $75 Conditions:None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant reviewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 6:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Complaint Filed at Counter - No Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.