Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 14:44:42 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Juan Manuel Nunez, JR

Case Summary

On 06/14/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Juan Manuel Nunez, JR. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nunez, Ralph. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9839

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nunez, Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Nunez, Juan Manuel, JR

Nunez, Juan Manuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Defendant's presence waived pursuant to PC 977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Certified Law School Student appearing- Comment: On Behalf of: People Name: A. Aramayo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: R. Shirzad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: A. De La Fuente Defendant Present: No

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Continuance to obtain California Drivers License Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: E. Mehling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: J. Balmer Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:41 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Dept. 97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno County Sheriff- Coroner's Office Citation #: 522803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less