This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 14:08:27 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Joshua Osborn Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 06/11/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Joshua Osborn Gonzalez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9626

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Gonzalez, Joshua Osborn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • Warrant Activated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Warrant Ordered Issued- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: No Bail Conditions: Night Service - No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Court orders defendant Jail Release status revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: 2:39 PM Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 2:39 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 97A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Previously set calendar date remains- Comment: Arraignment on 10/23/18 at 8:30 AM in Department 97A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: 11:00 AM Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Defendant remains on Jail Release

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: J. Flickner

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • Calendar Setting- Comment: Hearing Type: Arraignment Hearing Date: 9/4/2018 Department: 97A Time: 8:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Warrant Activated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Warrant Ordered Issued- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: $5,100.00 Conditions: Night Service - No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Court orders Defendant Cite status revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: 11:24 am Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:24 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 97A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency:Fresno Police Department Citation #:E0350397

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less