This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/06/2019 at 07:56:39 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Jose De Jesus Hernandez

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Jose De Jesus Hernandez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whitehead, Denise and Skiles, Jon M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9172

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whitehead, Denise

Skiles, Jon M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Hernandez, Jose DeJesus, III

Hernandez, Jose De Jesus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Programs; Attend and Complete (SB38) 18 Month Alcohol Program; Party: Hernandez, Jose DeJesus, III; Ordered; Order Date: 11/07/2018; Comment: Enroll by 12/5/2018; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 11/07/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 11/07/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 01/04/2019; Start Time: 6:45 PM; Concurrent: Concurrent to case M17930649; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 45 Days; Suspended: 0 Day; Suspended Reason: Referred to Adult Offender Work Program; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol; BAC Level: 0.16; Fee Totals ; ; $0.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Minute Order Corrected/Amended- Comment: Corrected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:22 AM ; 11:26 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Fines/Fees suspended as to count(s)- Comment: Fine amount: $1,895.00 Count(s): 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Defendant Released on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Defendant does not have the ability to pay for counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued Upon Court's Own Motion; Comment: Dept. 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Fingerprint on Back of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno County Detention Facility Citation #: S110562

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Financial info for Hernandez, Jose De Jesus: Transaction Assessment $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Financial: Hernandez, Jose De Jesus; Total Financial Assessment $0.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.