This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/03/2020 at 19:53:04 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Johnny Zuniga

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Johnny Zuniga. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nunez, Ralph, Kams, Timothy, de Alba, Ana and Orozco, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9170

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nunez, Ralph

Kams, Timothy

de Alba, Ana

Orozco, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Zuniga, Johnny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Program filed- Comment: COMPLETED 11/13/19 Program: WET RECKLESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Program filed- Comment: ENROLLED Program:WET RECKLESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketJUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Orozco, Gary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketPre-Trial- Judicial Officer: de Alba, Ana; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Sentence- Fee Totals ; Due: 12/15/2019; ; $678.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $728.00; Programs; Attend and Complete Wet Reckless-12 Hr Alcohol and Drug Prog; Party: Zuniga, Johnny; Ordered; Order Date: 09/20/2019; Comment: within 30 days; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 09/20/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/19/2022; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 90 Days; Stayed: 90 Days; Stayed Reason: On the condition defendant complies with Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: de Alba, Ana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: de Alba, Ana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zuniga, Johnny: Transaction Assessment $728.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Zuniga, Johnny; Total Financial Assessment $728.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketPublic Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: T. Gill Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCourt appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketProceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:25 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketArraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketJUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketFingerprint on Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCitation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno County Detention Facility Citation #: S110481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.